EP0889413 - System and method for interconnecting personal computer in computer workstation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303-4900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Sun Microsystems, Inc. 901 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303-4900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McDonald, John 85 Old Shirley Road Harvard, Massachusetts 01451 / US | [1999/10] |
Former [1999/01] | 01 /
NcDonald, John 85 Old Shirley Road Harvard, Massachusetts 01451 / US | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98305136.8 | 29.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | US19970885495 | 30.06.1997 Original published format: US 885495 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0889413 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0889413 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/38, G06F13/40 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
G06F13/387 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/01] | G06F13/38 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/51] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren um einen Personalrechner und einen Rechnerarbeitsplatzzu verbinden | [1999/01] | English: | System and method for interconnecting personal computer in computer workstation | [1999/01] | French: | Système et méthode d interconnection d ordinateur personnel à une station de travail d ordinateur | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/27] | 29.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.11.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.11.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5621900 (LANE THOMAS R ET AL) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 26 * * column 5, line 34 - line 45 *; | [Y]US5058068 (COSTABELLO CLAUDE) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8 * abstract *; | [A]US5469368 (AGRAWAL OM P ET AL) [A] 1-20 * abstract * |