EP0896317 - Color image display apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR, GB | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/06] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naka, Kazutaka, No. 303 Dai- 13 -yamani-haitsu 553 Shimokurata-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 244-0815 / JP | 02 /
Ohsawa, Michitaka 4-12-15 Fujisawa Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken 251-0052 / JP | 03 /
Kougami, Akihiko 1-4 Koyama-sou, 8-20-13 Gumisawa, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 245-0061 / JP | 04 /
Ohtaka, Hiroshi, No. 105 Kopo-shimokurata 557-1 Shimokurata-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 244-0815 / JP | [1999/06] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98305482.6 | 10.07.1998 | [1999/06] | Priority number, date | JP19970225727 | 07.08.1997 Original published format: JP 22572797 | [1999/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0896317 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0896317 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | [1999/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0896317 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/22 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
G09G3/2092 (EP,US);
G09G3/2003 (EP,US);
G09G3/2033 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0242 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0247 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0261 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0266 (EP,US);
G09G2360/18 (EP,US);
G09G3/20 (EP,US);
G09G3/2018 (EP,US);
G09G3/2029 (EP,US);
G09G3/22 (EP,US);
G09G3/28 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/06] | G09G3/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/05] |
Former [1999/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Farbbildanzeigeeinrichtung und -verfahren | [1999/20] | English: | Color image display apparatus and method | [1999/06] | French: | Méthode et appareil d'affichage d'image en couleur | [1999/06] |
Former [1999/06] | Farbbildanzeigeeinrichtung und -verfahren | Examination procedure | 30.07.1998 | Examination requested [1999/06] | 03.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 10.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 10.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 10.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.07.2008 | GB | 28.08.2008 | DE | 03.02.2009 | [2010/05] |
Former [2009/30] | DE | 03.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0621624 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-11,19,20 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - line 30 *; | [A]JPH0448535 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920529), vol. 16, no. 236, Database accession no. (E - 1210), & JP04048535 A 19920218 (HITACHI) [A] 1-11,19,20 * abstract * |