EP0892187 - Constant velocity ratio joint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NSK LTD Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states NSK LTD 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ouchi, Hideo c/o NSK Ltd., 1-5-50 Kugenumashinmei Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kayama, Shigeoki c/o NSK Ltd., 1-5-50 Kugenumashinmei Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | Moreland, David, Dr., et al Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98305640.9 | 15.07.1998 | [1999/03] | Priority number, date | JP19970191433 | 16.07.1997 Original published format: JP 19143397 | JP19970335500 | 05.12.1997 Original published format: JP 33550097 | JP19980180667 | 26.06.1998 Original published format: JP 18066798 | JP19980180668 | 26.06.1998 Original published format: JP 18066898 | [1999/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0892187 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0892187 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0892187 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/223, B60B27/00, B60B35/18 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
F16D3/2245 (EP,US);
B60B27/00 (EP,US);
B60B27/0005 (EP,US);
B60B27/0026 (EP,US);
B60B27/0036 (EP,US);
B60B27/0042 (EP,US);
B60B27/0094 (EP,US);
B60B35/18 (EP,US);
F16C19/187 (EP,US);
F16C43/04 (EP,US);
F16D3/223 (EP,US);
F16C19/186 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/19] |
Former [1999/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Homokinetisches Drehgelenk | [1999/03] | English: | Constant velocity ratio joint | [1999/03] | French: | Joint homocinétique | [1999/03] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 16.03.2000 | Observations by third parties | 18.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03007209.4 / EP1326027 | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2655103 (LOEHR & BROMKAMP GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 27; figure 1 *; | [Y]GB2127132 (GIRGUIS SOBHY LABIB) [Y] 1 * page 3, line 117 - page 4, line 94; figure 1 *; | [DY]WO9724538 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP], et al) [DY] 1 * figure 20B *; | [DY]JPH09177814 ; | [X]US4497495 (CHRISTIANSEN PAUL J [US]) [X] 3,4 * column 2, line 42 - line 63; figure 1 *; | [Y]GB1072475 (CITROEN SA ANDRE) [Y] 2 * page 1, line 67 - page 2, line 77; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB2088526 (LOEHR & BROMKAMP GMBH) [X] 3,4 * page 1, line 86 - page 2, line 9; figures 1,2 * | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 97, no. 11, & JP09177814 A 19970711 (NTN CORP.) [DY] 2 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9724538 | US5221233 | US5509856 | JPH07317754 | JPS57145824U | JPS59185425U | JPS6212021U | JPH09177814 | JPH09317783 | other | JPS57151102U | US4668111 | US4372628 | US4424047 | US4417643 | US4405032 | - HOFFMANN H. ET AL, "Motor Vehicle Wheel Bearing Mountings: Acual Solutions for the Large Series Production", BALL AND ROLLER BEARING ENGINEERING, (198302), pages 20 - 26, XP000889512 | - "CONSTANT VELOCITY UNIVERSAL JOINTS FOR AUTOMOBILES", CONSTANT VELOCITY UNIVERSAL JOINTS FOR AUTOMOBILES, XX, XX, XX, (19000101), page 01, XP000889513 |