EP0896081 - Fabrics formed of hollow filaments and fibers and methods of making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBA Fiberweb Sweden AB Box 913 601 19 Norrkoping / SE | [2009/47] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states BBA Fiberweb Sweden AB Box 913 601 19 Norrkoping / SE | ||
Former [1999/06] | For all designated states BBA Nonwovens Sweden AB Box 913 601 19 Norrkoping / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jennergren, Bengt Majviksgatan 19 603 64 Norrkoping / SE | 02 /
Nikko, Peter Grona Gatan 4 616 33 Aby / SE | 03 /
Linberg, Urban Granstigen 3 610 40 Gusum / SE | 04 /
Holmer, Hakan PL 6441 Villa Kolon, Upperud 464 40 Asensbruk / SE | [1999/06] | Representative(s) | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/41] | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [1999/06] | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 98305949.4 | 27.07.1998 | [1999/06] | Priority number, date | US19970054727P | 04.08.1997 Original published format: US 54727 P | [1999/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0896081 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0896081 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | [1999/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0896081 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP0896081 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | [2005/10] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0896081 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D04H13/00, D04H1/54, A61F13/15, D04H1/56, D04H3/03, D04H3/14, D04H3/16, B32B5/26, B32B23/08, B32B27/32, B01D69/08, D01D5/38, D01F1/08 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
A61F13/51478 (EP,US);
A61F13/15577 (EP,US);
A61F13/51121 (EP,US);
A61F13/51401 (EP,US);
A61F13/5148 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
D04H1/4291 (EP,US);
D04H1/43914 (EP,US);
D04H1/54 (EP,US);
D04H3/007 (EP,US);
D04H3/018 (EP,US);
D04H3/14 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15292 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3106 (EP,US);
Y10T442/60 (EP,US);
Y10T442/602 (EP,US);
Y10T442/612 (EP,US);
Y10T442/625 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/06] | D04H13/00, D04H1/54, A61F13/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/06] | Title | German: | Vliese aus Hohlfaden und Hohlfilamenten, Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1999/06] | English: | Fabrics formed of hollow filaments and fibers and methods of making the same | [1999/06] | French: | Tissus réalisés à partir de fibres et filaments creux, méthode de fabrication | [1999/06] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 28.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.2005
04.07.2005
ADMISSIBLE Reifenhäuser GmbH & Co. KG Maschinenfabrik Spicher Strasse 46 - 48 D-53839 Troisdorf / DE Opponent's representative Rohmann, Michael, et al, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.2005
04.07.2005
ADMISSIBLE Reifenhäuser GmbH & Co. KG Maschinenfabrik Spicher Strasse 46 - 48 D-53839 Troisdorf / DE Opponent's representative Rohmann, Michael, et al, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.2005
Reifenhäuser GmbH & Co. KG Maschinenfabrik Spicher Strasse 46 - 48 D-53839 Troisdorf / DE Opponent's representative Rohmann, Michael, Dr., et al, et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien Theaterplatz 3, Postfach 10 02 54 45127 Essen / DE | 27.07.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.01.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.02.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.02.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.02.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.02.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.10.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 23.04.2007 | Appeal received No. T0655/07 | 02.07.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.02.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 20.04.2007 | Appeal received No. T0655/07 | 18.02.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.02.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.2004 | BE | 22.09.2004 | CH | 22.09.2004 | FI | 22.09.2004 | LI | 22.09.2004 | NL | 22.09.2004 | DK | 22.12.2004 | GR | 22.12.2004 | SE | 22.12.2004 | PT | 22.02.2005 | CY | 27.07.2005 | IE | 27.07.2005 | LU | 27.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | GB | 27.07.2007 | ES | 28.07.2007 | [2009/09] |
Former [2008/26] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
PT | 22.02.2005 | ||
CY | 27.07.2005 | ||
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
LU | 27.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
GB | 27.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/15] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
PT | 22.02.2005 | ||
CY | 27.07.2005 | ||
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
LU | 27.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
CY | 27.07.2005 | ||
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
LU | 27.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
CY | 27.07.2005 | ||
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/17] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 22.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH03249254 ; | [X]JPH01156563 ; | [X]JPH04253857 ; | [XA]GB2041821 (CELANESE CORP) [X] 8 * claim - * [A] 1,4; | [X]US4699619 (BERNARDIN LEO J [US]) [X] 9-11,15,17,27 * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 8; claims 1,11,13,20-24 *; | [A]EP0277707 (UNITIKA LTD [JP]) [A] 1-30 * page 4, line 56 - page 5, line 31 *; | [A]EP0462574 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-30* figure 1; example 1 *; | [A]US5188625 (VAN ITEN THOMAS P [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 20 *; | [A]EP0596532 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-30 * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 8 *; | [X]US5622671 (PELLEGRIN MICHAEL T [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * column 1, line 35 - line 57; figure 1 * * column 7, line 22 - line 25 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 51, Database accession no. 91-372421, XP002108683 & JPH03249254 A 19911107 (UNITIKA LTD) [X] 1,8 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 30, Database accession no. 89-217676, XP002108684 & JPH01156563 A 19890620 (TOYOBO KK) [X] 1,8 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930125), vol. 017, no. 037, Database accession no. (C - 1019), & JP04253857 A 19920909 (OJI PAPER CO LTD) [X] 1,7,8,18-20,26 * abstract * | Opposition | US5614281 |