EP0895361 - Z-coder: A fast adaptive binary arithmetic coder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2017 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1999/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bengio, Yoshua 2729 Edoard Montpetit Montreal / CA | 02 /
Bottou, Leon Twin Lights Court J16 Highlands New Jersey 07732 / US | 03 /
Howard, Paul G. 5 Darryl Drive Morganville New Jersey 07751 / US | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Branderhorst, Matthijs Pieter Arie, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Asquith, Julian Peter, et al Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98305952.8 | 27.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | US19970054495P | 31.07.1997 Original published format: US 54495 P | US19980042007 | 13.03.1998 Original published format: US 42007 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0895361 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0895361 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03M7/40 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
H03M7/4006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/47] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Z-Kodierer: schneller adaptiver arithmetischer Kodierer | [1999/05] | English: | Z-coder: A fast adaptive binary arithmetic coder | [1999/05] | French: | Codeur-Z: un codeur adaptatif rapide | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 26.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/28] | 01.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/28] | Divisional application(s) | EP07105895.2 / EP1798860 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 19   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - LANGDON G, "An introduction to arithmetic coding", IBM JOURNAL OF RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT,US,IBM CORPORATION, ARMONK, vol. 28, no. 2, ISSN 0018-8646, page 135-149, XP002086019 [X] 1,7,13,22 * page 140, column R, paragraph 4 - page 142, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 143, column L, paragraph 2 * * figures 8,9 * | [X] - MITCHELL J L ET AL, "SOFTWARE IMPLEMENTATIONS OF THE Q-CODER", IBM JOURNAL OF RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT,US,IBM CORPORATION, ARMONK, vol. 32, no. 6, ISSN 0018-8646, page 753-774, XP000111580 [X] 1,7,13,22 * page 754, column L, paragraph 2 - page 756, column R, paragraph 4 * | [XP] - BOTTOU L ET AL, "The Z-coder adaptive binary coder", PROCEEDINGS DCC '98 DATA COMPRESSION CONFERENCE (CAT. NO.98TB100225), PROCEEDINGS DCC '98 DATA COMPRESSION CONFERENCE, SNOWBIRD, UT, USA, 30 MARCH-1 APRIL 1998, 1998, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc, USA, ISBN 0-8186-8406-2, pages 13 - 22, XP002127750 [XP] 1-4,6-16,18-41 * the whole document * | [A] - "SPEED-UP MODE FOR Q-CODER SOFTWARE IMPLEMENTATION", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, vol. 32, no. 8B, ISSN 0018-8689, page 17-20, XP000082193 [A] 29-41 * page 18, paragraph 2 * * page 18, paragraph 5 - page 19, paragraph 1 * |