EP0894637 - Multi-head printer with wide printing mode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | ||
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states CANON BUSINESS MACHINES, Inc. 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirabayashi, Hiromitsu Canon Business Mach., Inc., 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | 02 /
Yamada, Akitoshi Canon Business Mach., Inc.,3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98305954.4 | 27.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | US19970901139 | 28.07.1997 Original published format: US 901139 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0894637 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0894637 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | [1999/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0894637 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/54 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
B41J3/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/27] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Drucker mit mehreren Druckköpfen für grossen Druckbereich | [1999/05] | English: | Multi-head printer with wide printing mode | [1999/05] | French: | Imprimante à grande portée munie de plusieures têtes d'impression. | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 01.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 29.09.2004 | ES | 09.01.2005 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/27] | ES | 09.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0724965 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,15,29 * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 34 * * column 8, line 36 - line 52 * * column 12, line 21 - line 46 * * column 15, line 16 - line 50 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0331481 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,15,21,25,29,44 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 22 * * figures 4,9 *; | [A]US4204779 (JAMIESON JOHN W [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 30 - line 65 * * claims 1,2,12 * * figure 1 *; | [PA]EP0822086 (CANON KK [JP]) [PA] 1,2,4,5,11,15,29,30,32,33 * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 48 * * column 6, line 41 - column 9, line 9 * * column 12, line 51 - column 13, line 22 * * figures 1,2,6 *; | [PA]EP0822089 (CANON KK [JP]) [PA] 1,4,5,15,29,32 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 26 * * column 5, line 27 - line 48 * * column 8, line 39 - column 10, line 21 * * column 11, line 53 - column 12, line 42 * * figures 2,4,5,7,8,10 * |