EP0894509 - Bonding agent and method of bonding electrode to printed conductive trace for iontophoresis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/05] | Bonding agent and method of bonding electrode to printed conductive trace | ||
[2004/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vyteris, Inc. 13-01 Pollitt Drive Fair Lawn New Jersey 07410-2700 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states Vyteris, Inc. 13-01 Pollitt Drive Fair Lawn, New Jersey 07410-2700 / US | ||
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states Vyteris, Inc. 13-01 Pollitt Drive Fair Lawn, New Jersey 07410-2700 / US | ||
For all designated states Reddy, Vilambi Nrk 70 Hillside Drive Bloomingdale, NJ 07403 / US | |||
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | ||
For all designated states Reddy, Vilambi Nrk 70 Hillside Drive Bloomingdale, NJ 07403 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herman, Daniel F. 39 Hemlock Circle Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | 02 /
Reddy, Vilambi N.R.K. 70 Hillside Drive Bloomingdale, New Jersey 07403 / US | [2004/51] |
Former [1999/05] | 01 /
Herman, Daniel F. 39 Hemlock Circle Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | Representative(s) | Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1999/05] | Ruffles, Graham Keith MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98306063.3 | 30.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | US19970903048 | 30.07.1997 Original published format: US 903048 | US19970903049 | 30.07.1997 Original published format: US 903049 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0894509 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0894509 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0894509 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/30, A61N1/04 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
A61N1/0436 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/38] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Klebemittel und Verfahren zum Kleben einer Elektrode an eine gedruckte Leiterbahn für Iontophorese | [2004/27] | English: | Bonding agent and method of bonding electrode to printed conductive trace for iontophoresis | [2004/27] | French: | Agent de liaison et méthode de collage d'une électrode à une trace conductrice imprimée pour la iontophorèse | [2004/27] |
Former [1999/05] | Klebemittel und Verfahren zum Kleben einer Elektrode an eine gedruckte Leiterbahn | ||
Former [1999/05] | Bonding agent and method of bonding electrode to printed conductive trace | ||
Former [1999/05] | Agent de liaison et méthode de collage d'une électrode à une trace conductrice imprimée | Examination procedure | 06.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 16.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0549159 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [Y] 8,9; | [YD]WO9711744 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al) [YD] 8,9 * page 3, line 30 - line 32 * * page 9, line 11 - page 15, line 9 * * figure - *; | [A]EP0708582 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4820263 | US4927408 | US5084008 | WO9711744 | US5080546 | US5169382 | US5232438 |