EP0896277 - Image tester for game machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aruze Corporation 1-25, Ariake 3-chome, Koutou-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states Aruze Corporation 1-25, Ariake 3-chome, Koutou-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/06] | For all designated states Universal Sales Co., Ltd. Universal Bldg. Takanawa, 22-9, Takanawa 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Masaki, c/o Aruze Corporation Ariake Frontier Building A, 1-25, Ariake 3-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo, 135-0063 / JP | [1999/09] |
Former [1999/06] | 01 /
Ogawa, Masaki 1-25, Ariake 3-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo, 135-0063 / JP | Representative(s) | Smith, Peter James, et al Serjeants LLP 25 The Crescent King Street Leicester LE1 6RX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Smith, Peter James, et al Serjeants, 25 The Crescent, King Street Leicester LE1 6RX / GB | ||
Former [2000/02] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1999/33] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte, H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke, F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber, Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm, Dr. W. Weiss, Kopernikusstrasse 9 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/06] | SERJEANTS 25, The Crescent King Street Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98306248.0 | 05.08.1998 | [1999/06] | Priority number, date | JP19970224357 | 06.08.1997 Original published format: JP 22435797 | [1999/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0896277 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0896277 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | [1999/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0896277 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/26, G06F11/00, G06F11/273 | [1999/42] | CPC: |
G06F11/3664 (EP,US);
G06F11/273 (EP,US);
Y10S345/904 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/06] | G06F11/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2000/26] |
Former [1999/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anzeigeüberprüfungsgerät für Spielgerät | [1999/06] | English: | Image tester for game machine | [1999/06] | French: | Appareil de test d'images pour un jeu vidéo | [1999/06] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 05.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09122309 ; | [A]US5335342 (POPE GREGORY M [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 31; figure 1 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 097, no. 009, & JP09122309 A 19970513 (SANKYO KK) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - "AUTOMATED TESTING OF APPLICATION PROGRAMS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19860201), vol. 28, no. 9, ISSN 0018-8689, page 3726/3727, XP000715296 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |