EP0896914 - Automated vehicle washing systems using concentrated detergents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Turtle Wax, Inc. 5655 West 73rd Street Chicago Illinois, 60638 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/07] | For all designated states Turtle Wax, Inc. 5655 West 73rd Street Chicago, Illinois, 60638 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bagnara, Thomas J. 3011 W. 130th Avenue Crown Point, Indiana, 46307 / US | 02 /
Gibney, Thomas J. 1945 Slippery Rock Road Naperville, Illinois, 60565 / US | [1999/07] | Representative(s) | Crouch, David John, et al Bromhead Johnson LLP 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/07] | Crouch, David John, et al Bromhead & Co. 19 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 98306276.1 | 06.08.1998 | [1999/07] | Priority number, date | US19970909241 | 11.08.1997 Original published format: US 909241 | [1999/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0896914 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0896914 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60S3/04, B05B7/26 | [1999/07] | CPC: |
B05B7/24 (EP,US);
B01F25/312 (EP,US);
B05B7/26 (EP,US);
B60S3/04 (EP,US);
B01F2101/4505 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/43] |
Former [1999/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Automatisches Fahrzeugwaschsystem mit Benutzung von Waschmittelkonzentraten | [1999/07] | English: | Automated vehicle washing systems using concentrated detergents | [1999/07] | French: | Installations de lavage de véhicules automatisées utilisant des détergentes concentrées | [1999/07] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 18.08.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CY, FI, GR, LU, MC | 13.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.09.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]US5655713 (GIBNEY THOMAS J [US], et al) [PX] 1-3,5-8,10 * the whole document *; | [X]CA2156563 (TURTLE WAX INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10 |