EP0897105 - Method an apparatus for resetting a product scale of a retail checkout terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/07] | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lutz, Dusty Lee 490 Rosedown Way Lawrenceville, Georgia 30043 / US | [1999/07] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Brian, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Williamson, Brian, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [2004/35] | Williamson, Brian, et al Barker Bretell 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | ||
Former [1999/07] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | Application number, filing date | 98306417.1 | 11.08.1998 | [1999/07] | Priority number, date | US19970910702 | 13.08.1997 Original published format: US 910702 | [1999/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0897105 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0897105 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01G23/16 | [1999/07] | CPC: |
G07G1/0054 (EP,US);
G01G23/166 (EP,US);
G01G23/3735 (EP,US);
G07G1/0072 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/43] |
Former [1999/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Tarieren einer Artikelwaage für Abrechnungsterminal im Einzelhandel | [1999/07] | English: | Method an apparatus for resetting a product scale of a retail checkout terminal | [1999/07] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le tarage d'une balance pour produits d'un système d'enregistrement | [1999/07] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 03.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0060701 (ISHIDA SCALE MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * page 12, line 5 - page 13, line 9 * * page 15, line 15 - page 16, line 27; figure 4 *; | [A]GB2285687 (GOLD STAR IND SYSTEM [KR]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * page 9, line 18 - page 11, line 5 *; | [A]EP0124355 (ISHIDA SCALE MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * page 2, line 18 - line 21 * * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 14 *; | [A] - A.T. GAMBURER ET AL., "Analogue-code converter used with strain gauge hopper weigher", INSTRUMENTATION AND CONTROL, (196903), no. 3, page 21, XP002084137 [A] 1,7 * page 21, column L, paragraph 3 * |