EP0897986 - Aspartic proteinase 5 (ASP5) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza, P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Powell, David J, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | 02 /
Smith, Trudi, SmithKline Beecham Pharmaceuticals 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | 03 /
Kay, John, University of Cardiff-Wales Wales / GB | 04 /
Hill, Jeffrey SmithKline Beecham Pharmaceuticals New Frontiers Science Park South Third Avenue Harlow Essex CM19 5AW / GB | [1999/20] |
Former [1999/08] | 01 /
Powell, David J, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | ||
02 /
Smith, Trudi, SmithKline Beecham Pharmaceuticals 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | |||
03 /
Kay, John, University of Cardiff-Wales Wales / GB | |||
04 /
Hill, Jeffrey University of Cardiff-Wales Wales / GB | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al FJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98306444.5 | 13.08.1998 | [1999/08] | Priority number, date | US19970056480P | 21.08.1997 Original published format: US 56480 P | US19980111727 | 08.07.1998 Original published format: US 111727 | [1999/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0897986 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0897986 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | [1999/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0897986 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/57, C12N9/64, C07K16/40, A61K48/00, A61K31/70, A61K38/48, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/37, C12N1/21, C12N5/10 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C12N9/6478 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/11] |
Former [1999/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Aspartat proteinase 5 (ASP5) | [1999/08] | English: | Aspartic proteinase 5 (ASP5) | [1999/08] | French: | Protéinase aspartique 5 | [1999/08] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 31.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 11.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/44] | 23.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PDX]WO9811236 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [PDX] 1-6,8-14 * page 1, line 33 - page 2, line 8 * * page 3, line 7 - page 5, line 19 * * page 8, line 12 - page 13, line 5 * * page 14, line 32 - line 37 * * page 15, line 19 - page 17, line 16 *; | [PX]WO9813484 (INCYTE PHARMA INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-6,8-14 * page 7, line 22 - line 27 * * page 8, line 2 - line 13 * * page 11, line 12 - page 28, line 20 * * page 32, line 25 - page 33, line 16 *; | [PX]WO9822597 (OKLAHOMA MED RES FOUND [US]) [PX] 1-5,8-14 * page 4, line 20 - page 16, line 13; figure 4 *; | [E]WO9936550 (INCYTE PHARMA INC [US], et al) [E] 1-6,8-14 * page 5, line 15 - page 8, line 22 * * page 20, line 21 - page 21, line 8 * * page 30, line 22 - page 55, line 9 * * sequence listing SEQ ID NO:4 and 16 *; | [E]WO0004137 (INCYTE PHARMA INC [US], et al) [E] 1-6,8-14 * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 35 * * page 20, line 16 - page 40, line 5 * | [X] - KIYOSHI MORI ET AL., "Molecular cloning of a novel mouse aspartic protease-like protein that is expressed abundantly in the kidney", FEBS LETTERS, AMSTERDAM NL, (19970120), vol. 401, pages 218 - 222, XP002052496 [X] 1-6,8-14 * page 219, column L, paragraph 3 - page 220, column L, paragraph 2; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(96)01473-1 |