EP0901228 - Driver circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitel Semiconductor Limited Cheney Manor Swindon Wiltshire SN2 2QW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | For all designated states Mitel Semiconductor Limited Cheney Manor Swindon, Wiltshire SN2 2QW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Williams, Barry Wayne 55 Woodhall Road Colinton, Edinburgh, EH13 0HD / GB | 02 /
McNeill, John Neville 4 Sciennes House Place Edinburgh, EH9 1NW / GB | [1999/10] | Representative(s) | Blatchford, William Michael Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Blatchford, William Michael Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [1999/12] | Blatchford, William Michael Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [1999/10] | Hoste, Colin Francis The General Electric Company p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98306476.7 | 13.08.1998 | [1999/10] | Priority number, date | GB19970018556 | 03.09.1997 Original published format: GB 9718556 | [1999/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0901228 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/567, H03K17/691, H03K17/693 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
H03K17/567 (EP,KR);
H03K17/6877 (EP,KR);
H03K17/691 (EP,KR);
H03K17/693 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Treiberschaltungen | [1999/10] | English: | Driver circuits | [1999/10] | French: | Circuits d'attaque | [1999/10] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |