EP0903877 - Optical fiber dispersion compensation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hansen, Per Bang 301 La Reine Avenue, Apartment No. 4 Bradley Beach, New Jersey 07720 / US | 02 /
Jacobovitz-Veselka, Gloria Regina 304 Wembly Place Morganville, New Jersey 07751 / US | [1999/12] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307018.6 | 01.09.1998 | [1999/12] | Priority number, date | US19970928580 | 12.09.1997 Original published format: US 928580 | [1999/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0903877 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0903877 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0903877 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/18, H01S3/30, G02B6/34 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
G02B6/4215 (EP,US);
G02B6/29376 (EP,US);
H01S3/302 (EP,US);
H04B10/2525 (EP,US);
H04B10/2916 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/12] | H04B10/18, G02B7/34, H01S3/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/34] |
Former [1999/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dispersionskompensation in optischer Faser | [1999/12] | English: | Optical fiber dispersion compensation | [1999/12] | French: | Compensation de dispersion d'une fibre optique | [1999/12] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 18.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0554714 (CORNING INC [US]) [Y] 1-3,12-16 * page 5, line 26 - page 7, line 51 * * figures 11,14; example 2; tables 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0730354 (AT & T CORP [US]) [Y] 3,10,11,16 * column 1, line 10 - column 3, line 20 * * column 5, line 1 - column 8, line 46; figures 1-4 *; | [XAY] - HANSEN P B ET AL, "529KM UNREPEATERED TRANSMISSION AT 2.488 GBIT/S USING DISPERSION COMPENSATION, FORWARD ERROR CORRECTION, AND REMOTE POST-AND PRE -AMPLIFIERS PUMPED BY DIODE-PUMPED RAMAN LASERS", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (19950817), vol. 31, no. 17, ISSN 0013-5194, page 1460/1461, XP000528980 [X] 1,2,9,13-15 * page 1460; figure 1 * [A] 8 [Y] 1-3,10-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19951043 | [A] - ESKILDSEN L ET AL, "465-KM REPEATERLESS TRANSMISSION USING A 2.488 GB/S DIRECTLY MODULATED DFB LASER", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (19960501), vol. 8, no. 5, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 724 - 726, XP000589284 [A] 1-16 * page 724; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.491608 | Examination | EP0911926 |