EP0991133 - Electrochemical cells and components thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2002 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2002 [2002/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYOVAC CORPORATION 601 Rayovac Drive Madison Wisconsin 53711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states RAYOVAC CORPORATION 601 Rayovac Drive Madison Wisconsin 53711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oltman, John Edward 1649 Sharpes Corners Road Mount Horeb, Wisconsin 53572 / US | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | ||
Former [2000/14] | Harvey, David Gareth, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307052.5 | 02.09.1998 | [2000/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991133 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01M12/06, H01M2/02 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
H01M12/06 (EP);
H01M50/128 (EP,US);
H01M50/109 (EP);
H01M50/119 (EP,US);
H01M50/133 (EP,US);
H01M50/134 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/50] |
Former [2000/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrochemische Zellen und ihre Komponenten | [2000/14] | English: | Electrochemical cells and components thereof | [2000/14] | French: | Piles électrochimiques et leurs composants | [2000/14] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 06.10.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 15.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/20] | 03.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.10.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS54108222 ; | [A]EP0741427 (RAY O VAC CORP [US]) [A] 1-15,17 * page 2, line 5 - line 12 * * page 4, line 27 - line 49 * * page 5, line 12 - line 21 * * page 5, line 44 - line 53 * * page 6, line 4 - line 13 * * page 6, line 32 - page 7, line 14 * * page 7, line 21 - line 37 * * page 12, line 25 - line 38 * * page 13, line 1 - line 6 * * page 15, line 22 - line 31 * * page 16, line 7 - line 11 * * page 16, line 21 - line 47 * * claims 1-5; table 3 *; | [A]EP0741425 (RAY O VAC CORP [US]) [A] 1-15,17 * page 4, line 43 - page 5, line 8 * * page 5, line 36 - line 46 * * page 6, line 15 - line 46 * * page 7, line 10 - line 50 * * page 8, line 16 - line 54 * * page 13, line 47 - page 14, line 15 * * claims 3-6,8,10,13; table 3 *; | [A]EP0741424 (RAY O VAC CORP [US]) [A] 1-15,17 * page 4, line 43 - page 5, line 8 * * page 5, line 36 - line 46 * * page 6, line 15 - line 24 * * page 7, line 12 - line 52 * * page 8, line 19 - line 56 * * page 13, line 48 - page 14, line 2 * * claims 1-4,7-10; table 3 *; | [A]EP0741423 (RAY O VAC CORP [US]) [A] 1-15,17 * page 3, line 5 - line 12 * * page 5, line 43 - page 6, line 8 * * page 6, line 35 - line 46 * * page 7, line 15 - line 46 * * page 8, line 10 - line 36 * * page 9, line 17 - line 54 * * page 14, line 52 - line 58 * * page 16, line 25 - line 28 * * claims 1,5,8; table 13 *; | [DA]US5662717 (BURNS JOHN DAVID [GB]) [DA] 1,6,7,10,12,13 * column 3, line 61 - line 67 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 26 * * figures 2,3 * * column 10, line 47 - line 55 * * example 1 *; | [E]US5804327 (OLTMAN JOHN EDWARD [US]) [E] 1-17 * column 4, paragraph 33 - column 5, paragraph 26 * * column 6, line 57 - line 63 * * column 9, line 55 - line 67 * * column 11, line 13 - line 22 * * column 11, line 46 - line 60 * * column 12, line 39 - line 50 * * column 13, line 1 - line 48 * * figure 8; claims 1-18 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 79, no. 40, Database accession no. 79-72658B, XP002092761 & JPS54108222 A 19790824 (DAINI SEIKOSHA KK) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |