EP0911632 - Electrochemical gas sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2005 [2005/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senco Sensors Inc. 501-889 West Pender Street Vancouver British Columbia V6C 3B2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states Senco Sensors Inc. 501-889 West Pender Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6C 3B2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mallory, John 3447 Ponytrail Drive Mississauga, Ontario L4X 1V9 / CA | 02 /
Peng, Wenfeng 1562 Wintergrove Gardens Mississauga, Ontario, Canada L5M 3Z8 / CA | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Bryer, Kenneth Robert, et al Bryers LLP 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Bryer, Kenneth Robert, et al K.R. Bryer & Co. 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307333.9 | 10.09.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | CA19972215108 | 11.09.1997 Original published format: CA 2215108 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0911632 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/49 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
G01N27/4045 (EP,US);
G01N33/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, SE [2000/06] |
Former [2000/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, LI | ||
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrochemischer Gassensor | [1999/17] | English: | Electrochemical gas sensor | [1999/17] | French: | Capteur de gaz électrochimique | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 29.10.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.12.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, ES, FI, GR, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT | 17.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, CY, DK, LI | 31.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/42] | 01.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/41] | 11.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.01.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2002 | 30.09.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2003 | 30.09.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2004 | 30.09.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0762116 (J & N ASS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * figures 3-6 *; | [X]WO9614576 (CENTRAL RESEARCH LAB LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-18 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0293230 (NEOTRONICS TECHNOLOGY PLC [GB]) [A] 1-18 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5338429 (JOLSON JOSEPH D [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * figure 2 *; | [A]US5284566 (CUOMO CARLO E [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * figure 4 *; | [A]US5302274 (TOMANTSCHGER KLAUS [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4587003 (TANTRAM ANTHONY D S [GB], et al) [A] 1-18 * figure 6 * |