EP0904933 - Water-disintegratable wiping sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/13] | Water-disintegratable fibrous sheet having layered structure and wiping sheet comprising the same | ||
[2003/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP | ||
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182, Shimobun Kinsei-cho Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeuchi, Nachito, Research & Development Div. 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | 02 /
Konishi, Takayoshi, Research & Development Div. 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | 03 /
Yamada, Daisuke, Research & Development Div. 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Parry, Christopher Stephen Saunders & Dolleymore 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Herts. WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Parry, Christopher Stephen Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Herts. WD1 7HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307680.3 | 22.09.1998 | [1999/13] | Priority number, date | JP19970258740 | 24.09.1997 Original published format: JP 25874097 | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0904933 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0904933 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0904933 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B32B29/00, D21H27/38, A47K10/16 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
A47K7/00 (KR);
A47K10/16 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (US);
D21H27/38 (EP,US);
B32B2432/00 (US);
D21H11/04 (EP,US);
D21H17/26 (EP,US);
D21H17/66 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [2004/03] |
Former [2003/51] | DE | ||
Former [2001/04] | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE | ||
Former [1999/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | In Wasser zersetzbares Wischtuch | [2003/30] | English: | Water-disintegratable wiping sheet | [2003/30] | French: | Feuille essuie-tout désintégrable dans l'eau | [2003/30] |
Former [1999/13] | In Wasser zersetzbare mehrschichtige Faserstoffbahn und daraus hergestelltes Wischtuch | ||
Former [1999/13] | Water-disintegratable fibrous sheet having layered structure and wiping sheet comprising the same | ||
Former [1999/13] | Feuille fibreuse laminée désintégrable dans l'eau et feuille essuie-tout la contenant | Examination procedure | 16.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 11.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH01168999 ; | [A]EP0372388 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0531112 (JUJO KIMBERLY KK [JP], et al); | [A]US5487813 (VINSON KENNETH D [US], et al) [A] 1 * example 1 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891003), vol. 013, no. 442, Database accession no. (C - 641), & JP01168999 A 19890704 (KAO CORP) [AD] * abstract * |