EP0989727 - Improvements in image projection systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Electronic Imaging Limited Fuji Film House, 125 Finchley Road London NW3 6HY / GB | [2006/17] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Fujifilm Electronic Imaging Limited Fuji Film House, 125 Finchley Road London NW3 6HY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Westlake, Philip Andrew 15 Sandalls Spring Hemel Hempstead, Herts HP1 3QD / GB | 02 /
Bromley, Nigel Ingram 24 Burghley Court, Great Holm Milton Keynes, Bucks MK8 9EL / GB | 03 /
Stedman, Elaine Kathryn Flat 2, 14 Prospect Road St Albans, Herts AL1 2AX / GB | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307683.7 | 22.09.1998 | [2000/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0989727 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0989727 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
H04N1/00018 (EP,US);
H04N1/00002 (EP,US);
H04N1/00039 (EP,US);
H04N1/0005 (EP,US);
H04N1/00063 (EP,US);
H04N1/00068 (EP,US);
H04N1/00076 (EP,US);
H04N1/00408 (EP,US);
H04N1/1013 (EP,US);
H04N1/193 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/49] |
Former [2000/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbesserungen an Bildprojektionssystemen | [2000/13] | English: | Improvements in image projection systems | [2000/13] | French: | Améliorations apportées au système de projection d'image | [2000/13] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 05.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 22.09.2006 | [2008/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4827351 (SAKAMOTO MASAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,7,8,12-14 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH07107250 ; | [A]US4675533 (SHIMIZU KATSUICHI [JP]) [A] 1,2,7,8,10-14 * figures 1A,1B; claims 1-19 * * column 1, line 11 - line 52 *; | [A]US4691365 (NAGASHIMA NAO [JP]) [A] 7-14 * column 4, line 41 - line 68; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US4580172 (RAJAGOPAL GANESH [US]) [A] 1,3-5,11 * abstract *; | [A]US5214470 (DENBER MICHEL J [US]) [A] 7 * figures 1,2; claims 1-6 *; | [A]JPS63153680 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 095, no. 007, & JP07107250 A 19950421 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881104), vol. 012, no. 415, Database accession no. (P - 781), & JP63153680 A 19880627 (HITACHI LTD) [A] * abstract * |