EP0908542 - Yarns and industrial fabrics made from a fluoropolymer blend [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2001 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.10.2001 [2001/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstenJohnson, Inc. 4399 Corporate Road P.O. Box 118001 Charleston South Carolina 29423-8001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states AstenJohnson, Inc. 4399 Corporate Road P.O. Box 118001 Charleston South Carolina 29423-8001 / US | ||
Former [1999/15] | For all designated states Asten, Inc. 4399 Corporate Road, P.O. Box 108001 Charleston, SC 29423-8001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reither, John R. 104 Plantation drive Summerville, SC29483 / US | [1999/15] | Representative(s) | Gaunt, Robert John Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | Gaunt, Robert John Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98308093.8 | 05.10.1998 | [1999/15] | Priority number, date | US19970944998 | 07.10.1997 Original published format: US 944998 | [1999/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0908542 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0908542 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/32, D01F6/92 | [1999/15] | CPC: |
D01F6/92 (EP,US);
D01F6/32 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2915 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2929 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [2000/22] |
Former [1999/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Garne und technisches Gewebe hergestellt aus einer Mischung von Fluorpolymeren | [1999/15] | English: | Yarns and industrial fabrics made from a fluoropolymer blend | [1999/15] | French: | Fils et tissus industriels obtenus à partir d'un mélange de fluoropolymères | [1999/15] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 08.08.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9617019 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-8,10-17,19 * claims 1-5 * * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 20 * * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 17 * * page 6, line 1 - line 18 * * table 2 *; | [A]WO9210607 (ALBANY RESEARCH UK [GB]) [A] 1-4,9-13,18 * abstract * * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 4 * * claims 1-3,7,8 *; | [A]WO9505284 (SHAKESPEARE CO [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * page 3, line 27 - line 31 * * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 8 * * claims 1-14 * |