EP0908315 - Ink drop detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [1999/15] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schantz, Christopher A. 455 Seaport Blvd. Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 02 /
Sorenson, Paul R. 5561 La Cuenta Drive San Diego, CA 92124 / US | [1999/15] | Representative(s) | Powell, Stephen David, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | Powell, Stephen David, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 4 St Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 98308138.1 | 06.10.1998 | [1999/15] | Priority number, date | US19970946190 | 07.10.1997 Original published format: US 946190 | [1999/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0908315 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0908315 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0908315 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/125 | [1999/15] | CPC: |
B41J2/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/30] |
Former [1999/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tintentropfendetektion | [1999/15] | English: | Ink drop detection | [1999/15] | French: | Détection de gouttes d'encre | [1999/15] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 18.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4323905 (REITBERGER PETER H, et al) [X] 1,3-9,12,14 * column 4, line 46 - column 6, line 40; figures 1-5 * [A] 2,10,11,13,15; | [XA]US4128841 (BROWN MICHAEL K, et al) [X] 1,3-9,12 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 43 * [A] 2,10,11,13-15; | [A]EP0334546 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 5, line 39 - column 9, line 57 *; | [A]US4067019 (FLEISCHER JOHN MARTIN, et al) [A] * the whole document * |