EP0921509 - System and method for updating, enhancing or refining a geographic database using feedback [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Navigation Technologies Corporation The Merchandise Mart, Suite 900 Chicago Illinois 60654 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states Navigation Technologies Corporation The Merchandise Mart, Suite 900 Chicago, Illinois 60654 / US | ||
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states Navigation Technologies Corporation 10400 West Higgins Road Rosemont, Illinois 60018 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cherveny, Kevin 219 S. Kankakee Street Wilmington, Illinois 60481 / US | 02 /
Crane, Aaron 670 Wren Avenue Palatine, Illinois 60067 / US | 03 /
Kaplan, Lawrence M. 431 W. Oakdale Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60657 / US | 04 /
Jasper, John 824 North Drury Lane Arlington Heights, Illinois 60000 / US | 05 /
Shields, Russel T. 160 E. Pearson Chicago, Illinois 60611 / US | [1999/23] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98308256.1 | 09.10.1998 | [1999/23] | Priority number, date | US19970951767 | 16.10.1997 Original published format: US 951767 | [1999/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0921509 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0921509 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | [2000/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0921509 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/01, G08G1/0968 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
G01C21/3841 (EP,US);
G01C21/26 (EP,US);
G01C21/3811 (EP,US);
G01C21/3819 (EP);
G01C21/3822 (EP,US);
G01C21/3848 (EP,US);
G08G1/0969 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/23] | G08G1/01 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [2001/14] |
Former [1999/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | System und Vorrichtung zur Aktualisierung, Verbesserung und Feinung einer geographischen Datenbank unter Verwendung von Rückkopplung | [1999/23] | English: | System and method for updating, enhancing or refining a geographic database using feedback | [1999/23] | French: | Système et méthode de mise à jour, d'amélioration et d'affinage d'une base de données géographique par rétroaction | [1999/23] | Examination procedure | 15.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 27.01.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CY, GR, IE, MC, PT | 19.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.02.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.04.2004 | CH | 28.04.2004 | FI | 28.04.2004 | IT | 28.04.2004 | LI | 28.04.2004 | DK | 28.07.2004 | SE | 28.07.2004 | ES | 08.08.2004 | LU | 09.10.2004 | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/17] | BE | 28.04.2004 | |
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
DK | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
LU | 09.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | BE | 28.04.2004 | |
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
DK | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | BE | 28.04.2004 | |
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
LI | 28.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0377480 (POELSTRA THEO JOGCHUM [NL]) [X] 1,2,17,18,25 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 8 * * column 10, line 31 - column 11, line 23 *; | [X]US5164904 (SUMNER ROY L [US]) [X] 1,5,11,15-25 * column 5, lines 34-55 * * column 10, lines 8-34 * * column 11, lines 40-55 *; | [A]EP0715286 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 7,8 * column 2, lines 1-13 *; | [A]US5543789 (BEHR DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 19 ** figure 1 *; | [A]EP0752692 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, lines 45-54 * * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 14 *; | [X]EP0755039 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,6,9,11-13,17-21 * column 2, lines 1-36 * * column 7, lines 13-33 *; | [X]WO9729470 (MANNESMANN AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,10,14 * page 9, line 30 - page 10, line 15 * * figure 1 * |