EP0909964 - Dispersion shifted optical fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. 5-1 Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. No. 5-1 Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/16] | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. No. 5-1 Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuo, Shoichiro c/o Fujikura Ltd., Sakura Plant, 1440, Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Horikoshi, Masahiro c/o Fujikura Ltd., Sakura Plant, 1440, Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1999/16] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/16] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98308304.9 | 13.10.1998 | [1999/16] | Priority number, date | JP19970280915 | 14.10.1997 Original published format: JP 28091597 | [1999/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0909964 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0909964 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/036 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
G02B6/02009 (EP,US);
G02B6/02242 (EP,US);
G02B6/03666 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/16] | G02B6/16, G02B6/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/01] |
Former [1999/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dispersionsverschobene optische Faser | [1999/16] | English: | Dispersion shifted optical fiber | [1999/16] | French: | Fibre optique à dispersion décalée | [1999/16] | Examination procedure | 12.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 05.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9733188 (CORNING INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * page 8, line 23 - line 31 * * page 9 - page 12 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0774676 (CORNING INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 22 - line 59 * * page 4 - page 6 * * figures 1-3D; claim - *; | [A]EP0789255 (CORNING INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * page 6, line 36 - line 59 * * page 7 - page 8 * * page 9, line 1 - line 21 * * figure - *; | [A]EP0689068 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1,4 * column 5, line 9 - line 58 * * column 6 - column 8 * * column 11, line 12 - line 47 * * page 1, column 14, line 11 - line 58 * * column 15 - column 17 * * column 18, line 1 - line 13 * * figures 1,9-11 *; | [A] - LIU Y ET AL, "SINGLE-MODE DISPERSION-SHIFTED FIBERS WITH EFFECTIVE AREA LARGER THAN 80 MUM2 AND GOOD BENDING PERFORMANCE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION, (19950917), vol. 1, pages 333 - 336, XP000646740 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - MATSUO S ET AL, "DISPERSION SHIFTED OPTICAL FIBER FOR WAVELENGTH-DIVISION-MULTIPLEXING TRANSMISSION", FUJIKURA GIHO, (1993), pages 1 - 5, XP000749816 [A] 1 * the whole document * |