EP0912027 - Inter-working function selection system in a network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chuah, Mooi Choo 184B Eatoncrest Drive Eatontown New Jersey 07724 / US | 02 /
Parsons, Philip M. 6393 Glenbrook Court Lisle Illenois 60532 / US | 03 /
Rai, Girish 523 Lady Smith Road Bartlett Illinois 60103 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [1999/40] | 01 /
Chuah, Mooi Choo 184B Eatoncrest Drive Eatontown New Jersey 07724 / US | ||
02 /
Parsons, Philip M. 6393 Glenbrook Court#Lisle Illenois 60532 / US | |||
03 /
Rai, Girish 523 Lady Smith Road Bartlett Illinois 60103 / US | |||
Former [1999/17] | 01 /
Rai, Girish 523 Lady Smith Road, Bartlett Du Page, Illinois 60103 / US | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | Sarup, David Alexander Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd. Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [1999/17] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98308332.0 | 13.10.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | US19970061915P | 14.10.1997 Original published format: US 61915 P | US19980138905 | 24.08.1998 Original published format: US 138905 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0912027 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0912027 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/28, H04L12/56 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
H04W4/24 (EP,US);
H04L12/4633 (EP,US);
H04W12/02 (EP,US);
H04W12/033 (EP,US);
H04W12/068 (EP,US);
H04L2212/00 (EP,US);
H04L63/0272 (EP,US);
H04L69/16 (EP,US);
H04W36/0038 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/17] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2006/20] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | System für das Übergreifen von Funktionsselektierung in einem Netzwerk | [1999/17] | English: | Inter-working function selection system in a network | [1999/17] | French: | Système d'interfonctionnement de sélection de fonction dans un réseau de communication | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 18.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/43] | 05.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9621983 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * page 7, line 35 - page 12, line 25 * * figure 1 *; | [Y] - HAEMAELAEINEN J ET AL, "GSM ACCESS TO INTERNET", TELECOMMUNICATIONS, DEDHAM, MA, US, (199403), vol. 28, no. 3, ISSN 0040-2494, pages 37 - 38,40,42, XP000863798 [Y] 1-11 * page 37, column R, line 8 - page 42, column L, line L * * figures 1-5 * | [A] - PERKINS C ET AL, "IP Mobility Support", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (199610), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015007786 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * section 1 section 3 section 4 section 5 * |