EP0913258 - Heating apparatus for micro injecting devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon Kyunggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-ku Suwon, Kyungi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahn, Byung-Sun 624-2002 Dongbo Apt., Shinnamusil, Yongtong-Dong Paldal-gu, Suwon, Kyonggi-do / KR | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Dibb Lupton Alsop, Fountain Precinct Balm Green, Sheffield S1 1RZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98308420.3 | 15.10.1998 | [1999/18] | Priority number, date | KR19520082197 | 15.10.1997 Original published format: KR 5282197 | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0913258 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0913258 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | [1999/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/14, B41J2/16 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
B41J2/1628 (EP,US);
B41J2/05 (KR);
B41J2/14064 (EP,US);
B41J2/1603 (EP,US);
B41J2/1631 (EP,US);
B41J2/1646 (EP,US);
B41J2202/03 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/26] |
Former [1999/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Heizgerät für Mikroinjektionsvorrichtungen | [1999/18] | English: | Heating apparatus for micro injecting devices | [1999/18] | French: | Appareil de chauffage pour micro-dispositifs d'injection | [1999/18] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 02.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/01] | 06.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0332764 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8,11,17 * column 4, line 22 - column 6, line 18 * * figures 1,2; claims 4,6,7,9,10 * [Y] 3; | [Y]US5580468 (FUJIKAWA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * abstract * * column 10, line 22 - line 57 *; | [X]EP0594310 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,13,17 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 5 * * column 3, line 57 - column 5, line 10 * * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 6 * * figures 2,10; claims 1-6,8-10 *; | [X]JPH0911339 ; | [PX]US5804083 (ISHII YORISHIGE [JP], et al) [PX] * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 45 *; | [X]US5636441 (MEYER NEAL W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10,13,17 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 19 *; | [A]US4480259 (KRUGER WILLIAM P [US], et al) [A] * figures 1,2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 097, no. 005, & JP09011339 A 19970114 (SHARP CORP) [X] 1,2,4-7,12,13,16,17 |