EP0911827 - Recording and/or reproduction apparatus, file management method and providing medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/17] | Recording and/or reproduction apparatus, file management and providing medium | ||
[2011/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Tetsu, I.P.Dpt., Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Ishikawa, Akio, c/o I.P.D., Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | [2011/48] |
Former [1999/17] | 01 /
Kimura, Tetsu, I.P.Dpt., Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | ||
02 /
Ishikawa, Akio, c/o I.P.D., Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | Representative(s) | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98308530.9 | 19.10.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | JP19970288178 | 21.10.1997 Original published format: JP 28817897 | JP19980046855 | 27.02.1998 Original published format: JP 4685598 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0911827 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0911827 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | [2002/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0911827 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10, G11B27/32, G11B27/034, G06F17/30 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B20/1217 (KR);
G11B20/10 (EP,US);
G11B20/10527 (KR);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/36 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10537 (KR);
G11B2020/1232 (KR);
G11B2220/20 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/29] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungs- und/oder Wiedergabegerät, Dateiverwaltungsverfahren und Versorgungsmedium | [2011/26] | English: | Recording and/or reproduction apparatus, file management method and providing medium | [2011/26] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction, procédé de gestion de fichiers et support d'alimentation | [2011/26] |
Former [1999/17] | Aufzeichnungs- und/oder Wiedergabegerät, Dateiverwaltung und Versorgungsmedium | ||
Former [1999/17] | Recording and/or reproduction apparatus, file management and providing medium | ||
Former [1999/17] | Appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction, gestion de fichiers et support d'alimentation | Examination procedure | 25.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 12.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.06.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06018474.4 / EP1744316 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2005 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH08227577 ; | [A]EP0350920 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 38 - line 48 * * page 3, line 11 - line 36 * * page 13, line 8 - line 30 * * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0635835 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 7 * * claims 1-4,7 *; | [XA]US5475668 (AZUMATANI YASUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9 * abstract * * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 15 * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 25 * * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 50 * * claims 1-5 * [A] 7,8,10; | [A]EP0718845 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 20 - column 7, line 16 * * column 8, line 42 - column 10, line 52 * * figures 10,11 *; | [XP]EP0862180 (SONY PRECISION TECHNOLOGY INC [JP]) [XP] 1 * abstract * * column 5, line 32 - line 47 * * column 8, line 3 - column 10, line 10 * * column 12, line 27 - line 56 * * figures 3,5 *; | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 1997, no. 01, & JP08227577 A 19960903 (SONY CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 3,4 | [A] - DEVOY J C ET AL, "MEDIA, FILE MANAGEMENT SCHEMES FACILITATE WORM UTILIZATION", COMPUTER TECHNOLOGY REVIEW,US,WESTWORLD PRODUCTION CO. LOS ANGELES, vol. 8, no. 13, ISSN 0278-9647, page 48-49, XP000120798 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | [AP] - "DVD Read-Only Disk File System Specifications", ECMA TECHNICAL REPORT, Geneva, Switzerland, (199802), no. TR/71, XP002123679 | Examination | EP0709843 |