EP0913911 - One-way mechanism for single phase synchronous motors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/18] | Single direction single phase synchronous motor | ||
[2004/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Electric S.A. Ruelle du Repos 18 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | [1999/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ko, Fretrick Siu Kwan Flat 8B, Block 2 Kenswood Court, Kingswood Villas Tin Shui Wai, Yuen Long, N.T., Hong Kong / JP | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Higgins, Michael Roger A.R. Davies & Co. 27, Imperial Square Cheltenham Glos. GL50 1RQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Higgins, Michael Roger A.R. Davies & Co. 27, Imperial Square Cheltenham Glos. GL50 1RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98308556.4 | 20.10.1998 | [1999/18] | Priority number, date | GB19970022888 | 31.10.1997 Original published format: GB 9722888 | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0913911 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0913911 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0913911 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/118 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
H02K7/1185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/48] |
Former [1999/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einwegmechanismus für Einphasensynchronmotoren | [2004/50] | English: | One-way mechanism for single phase synchronous motors | [2004/50] | French: | Mécanisme unidirectionnel pour moteurs synchrones monophasés | [2004/50] |
Former [1999/18] | Einrichtungeinphasensynchronmotor | ||
Former [1999/18] | Single direction single phase synchronous motor | ||
Former [1999/18] | Moteur synchrone monophasé unidirectionnel | Examination procedure | 16.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 04.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2026956 (LICENTIA GMBH) [X] 1,2,8-10 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, line 3; figures 1,2 * [A] 3; | [X]FR2126690 (LICENTIA GMBH) [X] 1,2,8-10 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 11; figures 1,2 * |