EP0913757 - Protected software [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merkle, Ralph C. 1134 Pimento Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98308688.5 | 23.10.1998 | [1999/18] | Priority number, date | US19970960867 | 30.10.1997 Original published format: US 960867 | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0913757 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0913757 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | [2000/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
G06F21/121 (EP,US);
G06F21/1063 (EP,US);
G06F2211/008 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2135 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/41] |
Former [1999/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gesicherte software | [1999/18] | English: | Protected software | [1999/18] | French: | Logiciels protégés | [1999/18] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 03.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/43] | 02.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5553143 (ROSS CLIFF D [US], et al) [Y] 2-5 * column 3, line 3 - column 3, line 20 * * column 4, line 14 - column 9, line 16 *; | [A]WO9714085 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * page 17, lines 10-25 * * page 20, line 30 - page 21, line 1 * * page 22, lines 18,19 ** page 1, lines 23-31 *; | [A]EP0778512 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, lines 17-43 * * column 3, lines 24-54 * * column 8, line 14 - column 12, line 49 *; | [XY]EP0803789 (EUROP COMPUTER IND RES [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 13 - column 6, line 22 * * column 7, line 1 - column 7, line 44 * * column 11, line 1 - column 11, line 27 * [Y] 2-5 |