EP0913873 - Method to control a vibration motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/18] | Vibration motor control apparatus and method | ||
[2006/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/12] |
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Atsuta, Akio Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98308825.3 | 28.10.1998 | [1999/18] | Priority number, date | JP19970297379 | 29.10.1997 Original published format: JP 29737997 | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0913873 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0913873 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0913873 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/04 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
H02N2/142 (EP,US);
H02N2/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/26] |
Former [1999/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Vibrationsmotors | [2006/16] | English: | Method to control a vibration motor | [2006/16] | French: | Méthode de contrôle d'un moteur entraîné par des vibrations | [2006/16] |
Former [1999/18] | Steuerungsgerät für Vibrationsmotor und Verfahren | ||
Former [1999/18] | Vibration motor control apparatus and method | ||
Former [1999/18] | Dispositif de contrôle d'un moteur entraîné par des vibrations et procédé | Examination procedure | 12.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 22.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 21.03.2007 | NL | 21.03.2007 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/15] | NL | 21.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4914337 (TAKAGI TADAO [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP0624911 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1 * claims 1,5 * | Examination | US5612598 |