EP0984097 - Apparatus for processing permeable or semi-permeable webs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valmet, Inc. Alfred Road, Route 111, P.O. Box 502 Biddeford Maine 04005-0502 / US | [2006/27] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states Valmet, Inc. Alfred Road, Route 111, P.O. Box 502 Biddeford, Maine 04005-0502 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beaumont, Donald F. 195 Stillman Street Cape Elizabeth, Maine 04107 / US | [2006/09] |
Former [2000/10] | 01 /
Beaumont, Donald F. 195 Stilman Street Cape Elizabeth, Maine 04107 / US | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/10] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/10] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98309055.6 | 05.11.1998 | [2000/10] | Priority number, date | US19980146226 | 02.09.1998 Original published format: US 146226 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0984097 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0984097 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0984097 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D21F5/18, F26B13/16 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
F26B13/16 (EP,US);
D21F5/182 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/10] | D21F5/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/51] |
Former [2001/37] | |||
Former [2000/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von durchlässigen oder halbdurchlässigen Bahnen | [2006/06] | English: | Apparatus for processing permeable or semi-permeable webs | [2000/10] | French: | Dispositif pour le traitement de bandes perméables ou semi-perméables | [2000/10] |
Former [2000/10] | Vorrichtung zur Behandelung von durchlässigen oder halbdurchlässigen Bahnen | Examination procedure | 25.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 27.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24] | Request for further processing for: | 18.02.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 18.02.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.03.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.09.2001 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | 19.09.2001 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | 19.09.2001 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | 19.09.2001 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | 19.09.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | 19.09.2001 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | 19.09.2001 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | 19.09.2001 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | 19.09.2001 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | 19.09.2001 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | 19.09.2001 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | 19.09.2001 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | 19.09.2001 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | 19.09.2001 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | 19.09.2001 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | 19.09.2001 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | 19.09.2001 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | 19.09.2001 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.09.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   25.10.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.2003 | 30.11.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.07.2006 | CH | 05.07.2006 | CY | 05.07.2006 | FI | 05.07.2006 | LI | 05.07.2006 | NL | 05.07.2006 | DK | 05.10.2006 | SE | 05.10.2006 | GR | 06.10.2006 | LU | 05.11.2006 | IE | 06.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | PT | 05.12.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | BE | 05.07.2006 | |
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
GR | 06.10.2006 | ||
LU | 05.11.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | BE | 05.07.2006 | |
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
GR | 06.10.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/15] | BE | 05.07.2006 | |
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | BE | 05.07.2006 | |
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 05.07.2006 | |
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | CH | 05.07.2006 | |
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/17] | CH | 05.07.2006 | |
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB728687 (HALL & KAY LTD) [A] 1 * column W *; | [DA]US4542596 (BRYAND EDWARD T [US], et al) [DA] 1* column 2, line 23 - line 55; figure - * |