EP0917058 - Dynamic plug and play interface for output device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fung, Joseph Z. 18011 Grayland Avenue Artesia, California 90701 / US | 02 /
Mahuvakar, Vikram R. 103 N Valencia Street, Apt. No. A Alhambra, California 91801 / US | 03 /
Tan, Shee-Yan 19851 Calle Granada Walnut, California 91789 / US | 04 /
Troung, Ton Huu 8821 Thorpe Avenue Westminster, California 92683 / US | [1999/20] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98309105.9 | 06.11.1998 | [1999/20] | Priority number, date | US19970966407 | 07.11.1997 Original published format: US 966407 | [1999/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0917058 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0917058 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
G06F3/1288 (EP,US);
G06F3/1211 (EP,US);
G06F3/1226 (EP,US);
G06F3/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/08] |
Former [1999/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dynamische plug and play Schnittstelle für Ausgabevorrichtung | [1999/20] | English: | Dynamic plug and play interface for output device | [1999/20] | French: | Interface plug and play dynamique pour dispositif de sortie | [1999/20] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 09.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/10] | 02.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.10.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5075874 (STEEVES JOHN L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US5220674 (MORGAN WILLIAM E [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 68 * * column 6, line 1 - column 33, line 30; figures 1,3-13; claims 1-10 *; | [X]DE4422619 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 64 - column 6, line 10 * * column 7, line 38 - column 18, line 28 * * figures 1-28; claims 1-34 *; | [A]EP0653700 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 27 * * column 7, line 55 - column 24, line 10 * * column 26, line 36 - column 39, line 22 * * claims 1-38 *; | [X]WO9639656 (APPLE COMPUTER [US]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5655148 (RICHMAN DARRYL STEVEN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** column 3, line 25 - column 10, line 55; figures 4a-4c; claims 1-5 * |