EP0917084 - Illuminator apparatus for a scanner device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2011/10] |
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fork, David K. 1993 Farndon Avenue Los Altos, California 94024 / US | [1999/20] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98309137.2 | 09.11.1998 | [1999/20] | Priority number, date | US19970972043 | 17.11.1997 Original published format: US 972043 | [1999/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0917084 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0917084 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0917084 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00, H04N1/48 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
G06K7/10732 (EP,US);
H04N1/486 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/20] | G06K7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/22] |
Former [1999/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsvorrichtung für einen Abtaster | [1999/20] | English: | Illuminator apparatus for a scanner device | [1999/20] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage pour un dispositif de balayage | [1999/20] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 01.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.12.2010 | 06.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5866465 ; | [XA]US4558357 (NAKAGAWA KATSUMI [JP], et al) [X] 5-7,9,10 * column 4, line 27 - line 51; figure 7; claims 1,2 * [A] 1-4,8; | [A]US5483359 (YUMIBA TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [A]US5532467 (ROUSTAEI ALEX [US]) [A] 4 * figure 2A * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830712), vol. 007, no. 158, Database accession no. (E - 186), & JP58066465 A 19830420 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) [A] * abstract * |