EP0917023 - Process cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kumar, Ajay 51 South Ridge Trail Fairport, New York 14450 / US | 02 /
Bryant, Jerry W. 219 Woodsmoke Lane Rochester, New York 14612 / US | 03 /
Damji, Dhirendra C. 907 Meadow Ridge Lane Webster, New York 14580 / US | [1999/20] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98309142.2 | 09.11.1998 | [1999/20] | Priority number, date | US19970970847 | 14.11.1997 Original published format: US 970847 | [1999/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0917023 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0917023 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0917023 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/18 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
G03G15/02 (EP,US);
G03G21/1803 (EP,US);
G03G2221/0015 (EP,US);
G03G2221/1618 (EP,US);
G03G2221/1693 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/04] |
Former [1999/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Arbeitseinheit | [1999/20] | English: | Process cartridge | [1999/20] | French: | Unité de traitement | [1999/20] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 28.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6083068 ; | [A]US4725731 (LANG JOSEPH H [US]) [A] 1,3 * column A; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0738940 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * column 14, line 25 - line 37; figures 6,13,14,16 *; | [A]US5646718 (SUWA KOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 12, line 27 - column 13, line 51; figures 1,5,7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850910), vol. 009, no. 224, Database accession no. (P - 387), & JP60083068 A 19850511 (OLYMPUS KOGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |