EP0920181 - Communication apparatus and storage medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha No. 15-1, Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467 / JP | [2008/31] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA No. 15-1, Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asai, Norihiko c/o Brother Kogyo K.K., 15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467 / JP | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Price, Nigel John King, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/10] | Price, Nigel John King, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1999/22] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98309643.9 | 25.11.1998 | [1999/22] | Priority number, date | JP19970322789 | 25.11.1997 Original published format: JP 32278997 | [1999/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0920181 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0920181 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | [2000/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0920181 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
H04N1/32797 (EP);
H04M11/066 (EP);
H04N1/32117 (EP);
H04N1/33376 (EP);
H04N2201/3205 (EP);
H04N2201/3209 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/19] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ubertragungsgerät und Speichermedium | [1999/22] | English: | Communication apparatus and storage medium | [1999/22] | French: | Dispositif de communication et support d'enregistrement | [1999/22] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 20.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9710668 (KULAKOWSKI ROBERT T [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 5, line 30 - page 7, line 3 * * page 8, line 3 - page 9, line 6 * * page 15, line 18 - line 21 * * figures 1-3,5 *; | [A]WO9716916 (TELECOM INTERNET LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [X]WO9726753 (LINK WORLDWIDE INC I [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 5, line 10 - line 20 * * page 6, line 10 - page 7, line 22 * * figures 1,2 *; | [E]GB2338863 (RODRIGUES MICHAEL VICTOR [GB]) [E] 1-10,12,13 * abstract ** page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 27 * |