EP0923127 - Encapsulating semiconductor chips [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westcode Semiconductors Limited 30 Queen Charlotte Street Bristol, BS99 7QQ / GB | [1999/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Irons, Robert Charles 29 Hatherell Road Chippenham, Wiltshire SN15 3ST / GB | 02 /
Billett, Kevin Robert 2 Epsom Close, Cepen Park South Chippenham, Wiltshire SN14 0FB / GB | 03 /
Evans, Michael John 2 Springfield Buildings Chippenham, Wiltshire SN15 1LS / GB | [1999/24] | Representative(s) | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | ||
Former [1999/24] | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Southgate, Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | Application number, filing date | 98309738.7 | 27.11.1998 | [1999/24] | Priority number, date | GB19970025960 | 08.12.1997 Original published format: GB 9725960 | [1999/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0923127 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0923127 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/051, H01L23/48 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
H01L25/072 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/24] |
Former [1999/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verpackung von Halbleiterchips | [1999/24] | English: | Encapsulating semiconductor chips | [1999/24] | French: | Encapsulation de puces semiconductrices | [1999/24] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 07.04.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 22.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/16] | 06.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.05.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH098279 ; | [A]US4667219 (LEE JAMES C K [US], et al)[A] 1-16; | [DX]EP0702406 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [DX] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9843301 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1-16 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 097, no. 005, & JP09008279 A 19970110 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-16 * abstract * |