EP0921600 - Orientationless squib connector assembly for automotive air bag assemblies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB, IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomas & Betts International, Inc. 250 Lillard Drive Sparks Nevada 89434 / US | [2006/11] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states Thomas & Betts International, Inc. 250 Lillard Drive Sparks, Nevada 89434 / US | ||
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Thomas & Betts International, Inc. 250 Lillard Drive Sparks, Nevada 89431 / US | ||
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states Gauker, Bradford K. 20375 Villa Grande Circle Clinton Township, Michigan 48038 / US | ||
For all designated states Rhein, David J. 1009 Kinney Road Memphis, Michigan 48041 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/23] | Representative(s) | Howick, Nicholas Keith Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | Howick, Nicholas Keith CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98309971.4 | 04.12.1998 | [1999/23] | Priority number, date | US19970067538P | 04.12.1997 Original published format: US 67538 P | US19980197748 | 23.11.1998 Original published format: US 197748 | [1999/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0921600 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0921600 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0921600 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/506, H01R13/627, H01R13/703, H01R13/639, H01R13/436, B60R21/01 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
H01R13/7032 (EP,US);
H01R13/6272 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/23] | H01R13/506, H01R13/627, H01R13/703, H01R13/639 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/18] |
Former [1999/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Richtungsfreie Zündpille-Anschlusseinrichtung für Kraftfahrzeug-Luftsacksysteme | [1999/23] | English: | Orientationless squib connector assembly for automotive air bag assemblies | [1999/23] | French: | Ensemble connecteur d'amorce exempt d'orientation pour ensembles airbag d'automobiles | [1999/23] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 11.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/08] | Request for further processing for: | 01.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 01.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.03.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 15.03.2006 | ES | 26.06.2006 | GB | 04.12.2006 | [2008/15] |
Former [2006/50] | ES | 26.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0791987 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3,5 * the whole document *; | [DY]US5334025 (FOEHL ARTUR [DE]) [DY] 1-3,5 * abstract *; | [A]DE19617792 (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [DE]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 3, line 3 - line 39 *; | [A]GB2310087 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * page 6, line 34 - page 7, line 21 *; | [A]US5616045 (GAUKER BRADFORD K [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]EP0477044 (LABINAL SA [FR]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 19; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | EP0869883 | US5334025 | US5401180 | US19970067538 |