EP0933319 - Paper handling flap valve array system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yim, Mark H. 1091 Tanland Drive 215 Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 02 /
Jackson, Warren B. 160 Castenada Avenue San Francisco, California 94116-1407 / US | 03 /
Chase, James G. 3375 Alma Street, Apt. 160 Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 04 /
Biegelsen, David K. 200 Mimosa Way Portola Valley, California 94028 / US | 05 /
Cheung, Patrick C.P. 7852 Pineville Circle Castro Valley, California 94552 / US | 06 /
Berlin, Andrew A. 1789 Dalton Place San Jose, California 95124 / US | 07 /
Horne, Kenneth N. 926 Bautista Court Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98310172.6 | 11.12.1998 | [1999/31] | Priority number, date | US19970994138 | 19.12.1997 Original published format: US 994138 | [1999/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0933319 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0933319 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0933319 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65H5/22 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
B65H5/228 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87812 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/40] |
Former [1999/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | System mit einer Reihe von Klappenventilen für die Handhabung von Papier | [1999/31] | English: | Paper handling flap valve array system | [1999/31] | French: | Système à rangée de vannes à clapet pour la manipulation de papier | [1999/31] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3426800 (BAUER PETER) [A] 1; | [A]US4874273 (TOKISUE HIROMITSU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]WO9716769 (OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 2* the whole document *; | [E]EP0936387 (XEROX CORP [US]) [E] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5634636 | US5839722 |