EP0923878 - Process for making granular L-lysine feed supplement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2007 | Revocation of patent | published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARCHER-DANIELS-MIDLAND COMPANY 4666 Faries Parkway Decatur, IL 62526 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states ARCHER-DANIELS-MIDLAND COMPANY 4666 Faries Parkway Decatur, Illinois 62526 / US | ||
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states ARCHER DANIELS MIDLAND COMPANY 4666 Faries Parkway Decatur, Illinois 62526 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stevens, Joseph Michael 533 Spruce Lane, Monroe Georgia 30655 / US | 02 /
Binder, Thomas P. 2323 West Packard Street, Decatur Illinois 62522 / US | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Vogelsang-Wenke, Heike, et al Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Vogelsang-Wenke, Heike, Dr., et al Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/28] | Bond, Bentley George, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | ||
Former [2000/27] | Bond, Bentley George, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [1999/25] | Jones, Michael Raymond, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98310229.4 | 14.12.1998 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | US19970991145 | 16.12.1997 Original published format: US 991145 | US19980098948 | 17.06.1998 Original published format: US 98948 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0923878 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0923878 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0923878 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A23K1/16, C12P13/08 | [1999/25] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/34] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von granuliertem L-Lysin enthaltendem Futterzusatz | [1999/25] | English: | Process for making granular L-lysine feed supplement | [1999/25] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un complément alimentaire pour animaux granulaire et contenant de la L-lysine | [1999/25] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 16.06.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, GR, IE, LI, NL, PT, SE | 10.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.01.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03028707.2 / EP1424012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.03.2005
31.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE Degussa AG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | 02
11.04.2005
20.04.2005
ADMISSIBLE Ajinomoto Co, Inc. 1-1 Suzuki Cho, Kawasaki-ku Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP Opponent's representative Fischer, Heinrich Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.03.2005
31.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE Degussa AG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | ||
02
11.04.2005
20.04.2005
ADMISSIBLE Ajinomoto Co, Inc. 1-1 Suzuki Cho, Kawasaki-ku Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP Opponent's representative Fischer, Heinrich Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner, Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2005/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.03.2005
31.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE DEGUSSA AG Benningsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Halaxova, Eva Univerzitni 7 77200 Olomouc / CZ | 20.05.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.02.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.07.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.07.2007 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/47] | 05.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.07.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.07.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DD139205 (BERGMANN HORST, et al)[A] 1-24; | [A]EP0491638 (ARCHER DANIELS MIDLAND CO [US]) [A] 21 * claims 2,3 *; | [XAY]US5431933 (BINDER WOLFRAM [DE], et al) [X] 1-9,14-20 * column 1, lines 65-68 * * column 2, line 12 * * column 6, lines 32-36 * * column 7, lines 20-33 * * column 7, lines 40-51 * * example 4 * * column 2, lines 53-60 * [A] 22-24 [Y] 10-13; | [DY]WO9523129 (AECI LTD [ZA], et al) [DY] 10-13 * examples 1-10 *; | [XA]DE19621930 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 19,21 * page 3, lines 16,17 * * page 4, lines 38-44 * * page 5, lines 2-5 * * page 5, lines 46-55 * * page 6, lines 8-12 * * page 6, lines 34,35 * * page 5, lines 30-33 * [A] 22-24 |