EP0924813 - Connector for thin cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN SOLDERLESS TERMINAL MFG CO LTD 4-8 Minamisenba 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states JAPAN SOLDERLESS TERMINAL MFG CO LTD 4-8 Minamisenba 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogura, Toshiaki A201, 1191-1, Chitose, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0022 / JP | 02 /
Ohta, Yuzuru 402, 1-10, Seta 5-chome, Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2134 / JP | [1999/34] |
Former [1999/25] | 01 /
Ogura, Toshiaki A201, 119-1, Chitose, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0022 / JP | ||
02 /
Ohta, Yuzuru 402, 1-10, Seta 5-chome, Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2134 / JP | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 98310256.7 | 15.12.1998 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | JP19970348111 | 17.12.1997 Original published format: JP 34811197 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0924813 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0924813 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/20 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
H01R12/722 (EP,US);
H01R12/7023 (EP,US);
H01R12/721 (EP,US);
H01R13/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/25] | H01R23/70, H01R23/72 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/15] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbinder für eine dünne Kassette | [1999/25] | English: | Connector for thin cartridge | [1999/25] | French: | Connecteur pour un étui mince | [1999/25] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/42] | 17.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.02.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.02.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5409385 (TAN HAW-CHAN [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2; | [Y]US5364292 (BETHURUM GARY C [US]) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 24 - line 28 *; | [A]US5502617 (TSUKADA KATSUMI [JP], et al) [A] 2 * figure 1 *; | [XY]US5622519 (BIXLER CRAIG [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * column 3, line 31 - line 57; figure 1 * [Y] 6-10; | [A]JPH0817515 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1,2 * figure 8 *; | [Y]WO9711514 (WHITAKER CORP [US], et al) [Y] 6-9 * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9740555 (WHITAKER CORP [US], et al) [Y] 10 * figure 1C *; | [A]US5562507 (KAN BRIGHT [TW]) [A] 3 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9607218 (HOSIDEN CORP [JP], et al) [A] 3 * figures 1,3,9 *; | [A]US5643008 (TAN HAW-CHAN [US], et al) [A] 3 * figure 3 * |