EP0926225 - An environmentally compatible solid film lubricant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states USBI Co. 188 Sparkman Drive Huntsville AL 35807 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states USBI Co. 188 Sparkman Drive Huntsville AL 35807 / US | ||
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states USBI, CO. P.O. Box 1900, 188 Sparkman Drive Huntsville, AL 35807 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Novak, Howard L. 353 Peregrine Drive Indiatlantic, Florida 32903 / US | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98310428.2 | 18.12.1998 | [1999/26] | Priority number, date | US19970994767 | 19.12.1997 Original published format: US 994767 | [1999/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0926225 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0926225 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | [1999/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0926225 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C10M169/04, // (C10M107/32, 107:44, 107:50, 125:22, 125:26), C10N30:06, C10N40:00, C10N50:08 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
C10M111/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/30 (EP,US);
C08K3/38 (EP,US);
C10M169/04 (EP,US);
C10M2201/062 (EP,US);
C10M2201/066 (EP,US);
C10M2201/087 (EP,US);
C10M2209/00 (EP,US);
C10M2209/02 (EP,US);
C10M2209/10 (EP,US);
C10M2209/101 (EP,US);
C10M2217/00 (EP,US);
C10M2217/02 (EP,US);
C10M2217/04 (EP,US);
C10M2217/042 (EP,US);
C10M2217/043 (EP,US);
C10M2229/042 (EP,US);
C10N2040/00 (EP,US);
C10N2040/30 (EP,US);
C10N2040/32 (EP,US);
C10N2040/34 (EP,US);
C10N2040/36 (EP,US);
C10N2040/38 (EP,US);
C10N2040/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/26] | C10M169/04, C08K3/38, C08K3/32, F42B12/80, // (C10M169/04, 107:32, 107:44, 107:50, 125:22, 125:26), C10N30:06, C10N40:00, C10N50:08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/17] |
Former [1999/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ein umweltfreundlicher fester Schmierfilm | [1999/26] | English: | An environmentally compatible solid film lubricant | [1999/26] | French: | Un lubrifiant sous forme de film solide compatible avec l'environnement | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 28.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 19.02.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 13.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.03.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9325642 (ARCH DEV CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,13,15 * claims 14,15 *; | [X]JPS63135616 ; | [X]SU876681 ; | [A]US3223626 (MURPHY JR GEORGE P, et al) [A] 1-6,8,10,13-15 * column 1, line 47 - line 60 * * column 3, line 18 - line 26 *; | [A]SU817351 ; | [A]JPS62125023 ; | [A]US5282985 (ZABINSKI JEFFREY S [US], et al) [A] * claim 2 *; | [A]US5173204 (CHIDDICK KELVIN S [CA], et al) [A] * column 8; example 1 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 29, Database accession no. 88-200219, XP002105472 & JPS63135616 A 19880608 (OILESS IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,13,15 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 35, Database accession no. 1982-74034E, XP002105473 & SU876681 A 19811030 (AS BELO METAL POLYM) [X] 1,13,15 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 02, Database accession no. 1982-03406E, XP002105474 & SU817351 A 19810330 (NOSOVSKII I G) [A] 1,7,9 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 28, Database accession no. 87-195569, XP002105475 & JPS62125023 A 19870606 (KANAI H) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |