EP0926526 - Optical device and method for selecting object of focus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onoda, Hitoshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ohtaka, Keiji Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kadohara, Terutake Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98310578.4 | 22.12.1998 | [1999/26] | Priority number, date | JP19970358512 | 25.12.1997 Original published format: JP 35851297 | [1999/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0926526 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0926526 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0926526 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/28, G02B7/34 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
G02B7/36 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/26] | G02B7/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/35] |
Former [1999/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optische Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Auswahl eines Fokusobjektes | [1999/26] | English: | Optical device and method for selecting object of focus | [1999/26] | French: | Dispositif optique et méthode pour la sélection de l'objet à focaliser | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 18.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14] | Request for further processing for: | 30.03.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.04.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4994843 (KITAZAWA TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,13,16,23,24,27 * column 1, line 12 - line 35 * * column 1, line 38 - line 58 * * column 5, line 18 - line 37 * * figure - * [A] 9,20; | [A]US5913082 (ONODA HITOSHI [JP]) [A] 1,9,12,13,16,20,21,23,27 * column 4, line 26 - line 63 * * column 8, line 10 - line 44 * * column 9, line 35 - line 62 * * figure - *; | JPH09127405 [ ] (CANON KK); | [DA]US5615398 (MATSUYAMA SHINICHI [JP]) [DA] 1,9,12,13,16,20,21,23,27 * column 4, line 40 - line 57 * * figure - *; | [A]US5311241 (AKASHI AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1,16,27 * abstract * | Examination | JPH09211316 | JPH09127405 |