EP0924408 - Method for cooling a component of a gas turbine engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nikkanen, John P. 47 Selden Hill Drive West Hartford, Connecticut 06107 / US | 02 /
Sandahl, Steven D. 9 Johnny Cake Lane Glastonbury, Connecticut 06033 / US | 03 /
Zysman, Steven H. 91 Congress Drive Amston, Connecticut 06231 / US | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98310588.3 | 22.12.1998 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | US19970996009 | 22.12.1997 Original published format: US 996009 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0924408 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0924408 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | [2001/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/12, F02C7/14 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
F02C7/14 (EP);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/04] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Methode zur Kühlung von Komponenten eines Gasturbinentriebwerks | [1999/25] | English: | Method for cooling a component of a gas turbine engine | [1999/25] | French: | Méthode de refroidissement pour des éléments d'un turboréacteur | [1999/25] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/10] | 19.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5269135 (VERMEJAN ALEXANDER E [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9 * figure - *; | [A]US3910375 (HACHE JEAN GEORGES EDOUARD JOS, et al) [A] 8 * figure - * | by applicant | US4151710 | US4474001 |