EP0856483 - Postal item feeding device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOPOST INDUSTRIE 113 rue Jean-Marin Naudin 92220 Bagneux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | For all designated states NEOPOST INDUSTRIE 113 rue Jean-Marin Naudin F-92220 Bagneux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Lierde, Olivier 41 rue Fontaine Grelot 92340 Bourg La Reine / FR | 02 /
Philippe, Alain 32 rue de Therouanne 77178 Saint Pathus / FR | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98400120.6 | 22.01.1998 | [1998/32] | Priority number, date | FR19970001052 | 31.01.1997 Original published format: FR 9701052 | [1998/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0856483 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0856483 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65H3/46 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
B65H3/46 (EP,US);
B65H2301/42322 (EP,US);
B65H2511/13 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1916 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/13, B65H2220/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/16] |
Former [1998/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Postgut-Fördervorrichtung | [1998/32] | English: | Postal item feeding device | [1998/32] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation en articles de courrier | [1998/32] | Examination procedure | 23.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 18.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4850580 (DENZIN HORST [DE], et al) [DA] 1-10 * column W *; | [A]US5203263 (BERGER ERWIN [CH], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0542550 (VIDEOJET SYSTEMS INT [US]) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [A]EP0591526 (ACE DENKEN KK [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * |