EP0872858 - Multiple parallel conductor for windings of electric devices and machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexans 16, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | [2001/32] |
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krenzer, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Christianenburg 6 34454 Arolsen / DE | 02 /
Runge, Joachim Burgstrasse 46 34454 Arolsen / DE | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Döring, Roger, et al Patentanwalt Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Döring, Roger, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt, Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | ||
Former [2001/27] | Feray, Valérie, et al Cabinet FERAY/LENNE 44/52, Rue de la Justice 75020 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/16] | Döring, Roger, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt, Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | ||
Former [2001/15] | Feray, Valérie, et al Cabinet FERAY/LENNE 44/52, Rue de la Justice 75020 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/43] | Mende, Dirk Alcatel Alsthom, Intellectual Property Department, Kabelkamp 20 30179 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 98400794.8 | 03.04.1998 | [1998/43] | Priority number, date | DE1997115978 | 17.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19715978 | DE1997127758 | 01.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19727758 | [1998/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0872858 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0872858 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | [1999/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/32, H01B7/00 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
H01F27/323 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/43] | H01F27/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, IT, NL [1999/44] |
Former [1998/43] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mehrfachparallelleiter für Wicklungen elektrischer Geräte und Maschinen | [1998/43] | English: | Multiple parallel conductor for windings of electric devices and machines | [1998/43] | French: | Conducteur parallèle multiple pour enroulements de machines et appareils électriques | [1998/43] | Examination procedure | 22.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/12] | 18.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/45] | 05.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2402149 (TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AG) [A] 5,9 * page 3, paragraph 2 *; | [A]US4041237 (STINE CLIFFORD R, et al); | [A]FR2394156 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [X]WO9210840 (RAYCHEM LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * page 5, line 8 - line 11 *; | [A]US5577366 (HIGGINS PETER [GB]); | [E]EP0859381 (INVEX FILI ISOLATI SPECIALI S [IT]) [E] 1-3,5,8 * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 23 * |