EP0887228 - Light beam aiming device for a vehicle headlamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [1999/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jamilloux, Olivier 30, Rue Artistide Briand 78540 Vernouillet / FR | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Bentz, Jean-Paul, et al Cabinet Weinstein 56A Rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Bentz, Jean-Paul, et al Cabinet Weinstein, 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1999/01] | Corret, Hélène, et al Cabinet Weinstein, 20, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98401500.8 | 18.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | FR19970007790 | 23.06.1997 Original published format: FR 9707790 | [1999/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0887228 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0887228 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/068 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
B60Q1/0683 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, PT, SE [1999/36] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Kontrolle der Neigung des Lichtstrahls eines Kfz-Scheinwerfers | [1999/01] | English: | Light beam aiming device for a vehicle headlamp | [1999/01] | French: | Dispositif de réglage de l'orientation d'un faisceau lumineux émis par un projecteur de véhicule automobile | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 03.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 13.02.2003 | SE | 13.02.2003 | CH | 30.06.2003 | LI | 30.06.2003 | [2004/33] |
Former [2003/29] | PT | 13.02.2003 | |
SE | 13.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/19] | SE | 13.02.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2624453 (SIEM SRL [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2577013 (COMIND SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE2339837 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1 * figure 10 *; | [A]JPS60259539 ; | [A]DE3028700 (WESTFAELISCHE METALL INDUSTRIE [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860517), vol. 10, no. 134, Database accession no. (M - 479)<2191> , & JP60259539 A 19851221 (NISSAN JIDOSHA KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2636578 | FR2725169 |