EP0966989 - New lightning equipment with optical fibers in the field of cosmetology and phototherapy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chiron, Bernard 38 rue des Alouettes 92000 Nanterre / FR | For all designated states Mondin, Jean-Daniel 1 Rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states Chiron, Bernard 4, Avenue du Château 92190 Meudon / FR | ||
For all designated states Mondin, Jean-Daniel 1 Rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/52] | Application number, filing date | 98401529.7 | 22.06.1998 | [1999/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0966989 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
A61N5/0614 (EP);
A61N5/0616 (EP);
A61N2005/063 (EP);
A61N2005/0636 (EP);
A61N2005/0639 (EP);
A61N2005/0655 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/36] |
Former [1999/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Neue Beleuchtungsausrüstung versehen mit optischen Fasern zur Anwendung in der Kosmetologie und der Phototherapie | [1999/52] | English: | New lightning equipment with optical fibers in the field of cosmetology and phototherapy | [1999/52] | French: | Nouveaux equipements d'éclairage à fibres optiques pour applications de cosmétologie et photothérapie | [1999/52] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.08.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.08.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19502980 (IMAB STIFTUNG [LI]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 2, column 26 - column 38 * * column 3, line 34 - line 41; claim 3 *; | [A]EP0612539 (KOENIG KLAUS [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5300097 (LERNER ETHAN A [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5344433 (TALMORE ELI [IL]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 7 * |