EP0974409 - Method of notching tubes and tubes obtained by such a method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etablissements Garconnet Route d'Envermeu 76510 Saint Nicolas d'Aliermont / FR | For all designated states Vasseur, Jean-Pierre Route de Dieppe 76510 Saint Vaast d'Equiqueville / FR | [2000/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VASSEUR Jean-Pierre Route de Dieppe 76510 ST Vaast d'Equiqueville / FR | 02 /
GARCONNET Claude 8 Route d'Envermeu 76510 St Nicolas D'Alt / FR | 03 /
GARCONNET Dominique 8, Route d'Envermeu 76510 St Nicolas D'Alt / FR | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Cabinet HERRBURGER 67 avenue Niel 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Cabinet HERRBURGER 115, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98401857.2 | 21.07.1998 | [2000/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0974409 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0974409 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B21D22/02, B60N2/48 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
B21D22/04 (EP,US);
B60N2/818 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49622 (EP,US);
Y10T29/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/40] |
Former [2000/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | LT | 16.01.1999 | LV | 16.01.1999 | MK | 16.01.1999 | RO | 16.01.1999 | SI | 16.01.1999 | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Rastnuten in Rohren, sowie durch das Verfahren hergestellten Rohre | [2000/04] | English: | Method of notching tubes and tubes obtained by such a method | [2000/04] | French: | Procédé de crantage de tubes ainsi que tube obtenu par la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [2000/04] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 18.01.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 30.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 30.07.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 08.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC | 12.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.08.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.09.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.11.2001 | GB | 14.11.2001 | NL | 14.11.2001 | PT | 14.02.2002 | SE | 14.02.2002 | ES | 30.05.2002 | BE | 31.07.2002 | CH | 31.07.2002 | LI | 31.07.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/51] | AT | 14.11.2001 | |
GB | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 14.11.2001 | |
GB | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 14.11.2001 | |
GB | 14.11.2001 | ||
NL | 14.11.2001 | ||
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 14.11.2001 | |
PT | 14.02.2002 | ||
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | PT | 14.02.2002 | |
SE | 14.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 14.02.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4679850 (BIANCHI FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [A] 1,5 * figure 2 *; | [A]FR2612096 (LAVIGNE BERNARD [FR]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [XA]DE29714315U (KOHLHAGE VERBINDUNGSTECHNIK GM [DE]) [X] 5 * page 2, lines 25-34; figures 1-3 * [A] 1-4 |