EP0899213 - Pump-type packaging unit for a liquid or semi-liquid product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2002 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.2002 [2002/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ponton, Thierry 6-8, Rue des Bordeaux 94220 Charenton Le Pont / FR | [1999/09] | Representative(s) | Boulard, Denis L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | Boulard, Denis L'Oreal, D.P.I., 90 rue du Général Roguet 92583 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98401861.4 | 21.07.1998 | [1999/09] | Priority number, date | FR19970010708 | 27.08.1997 Original published format: FR 9710708 | [1999/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0899213 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0899213 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | [1999/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0899213 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/16, B05B11/00 | [1999/09] | CPC: |
B65D83/206 (EP,US);
B05B11/0056 (EP,US);
B05B11/1015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/11] |
Former [1999/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mit einer Pumpe versehene Verpackungseinheit für ein flüssiges oder halbflüssiges Produktes | [1999/09] | English: | Pump-type packaging unit for a liquid or semi-liquid product | [1999/09] | French: | Ensemble de conditionnement d'un produit liquide ou semi liquide du type à pompe | [1999/09] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 04.10.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 22.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.11.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.01.2001 | Observations by third parties | 22.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3262607 (HIRSCH WALTER F) [A] 14 * column 2, lines 60-72; figure 1 *; | [A]US3640274 (COSTELLO CHRISTOPHER HOLLET) [A] 1,7,10,28 * column 3, lines 25-42 * * column 4, lines 3-16; figures 17,18 *; | [XY]NL7312873 (PHILIPS NV) [X] 1-3,9,12 * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 24; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5,6,11,13,14,21,22; | [Y]GB1515816 (AFA CORP) [Y] 21,22 * page 3, lines 104-119; figure 1 *; | [YD]FR2391625 (COSTER TECNOLOGIE SPECIALI SPA [IT]) [YD] 5,6 * page 1, line 37 - page 2, line 40; figure 1 *; | [Y]GB2098281 (TERMOLAR SA) [Y] 11,13 * page 2, lines 79-120; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0082757 (ALLIBERT SA [FR]) [A] 19,20 * page 3, line 10 - page 5, line 11; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]EP0323874 (DOUWE EGBERTS TABAKSFAB [NL]) [Y] 14 * column 7, line 63 - column 8, line 15; figure 2 * * column 9, lines 24-57 *; | [A]EP0426408 (TOP KK [JP]) [A] 23-25 * column 5, lines 7-55; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0497739 (KELLER WILHELM A [CH]) [A] 21,23* page 1, lines 29-54; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0605890 (PACKAGE RESEARCH INC [US]) [A] 15,16 * column 7, line 46 - column 8, line 5; figures 18,19 * | other | NL7312873 | GB2098281 |