EP0897793 - Geotextile filter structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bidim Geosynthetics S.A. 9, rue Marcel Paul 95873 Bezons Cedex / FR | [1999/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delmas, Philippe 2, Square Ampère 78330 Fontenay le Fleury / FR | 02 /
Artieres Olivier 33, avenue Ronce 78500 Sartrouville / FR | [1999/08] | Representative(s) | Le Bras, Hervé, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | Le Bras, Hervé, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98402016.4 | 07.08.1998 | [1999/08] | Priority number, date | FR19970010325 | 13.08.1997 Original published format: FR 9710325 | [1999/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0897793 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0897793 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/26, E02B3/12 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B5/02 (US);
B32B2262/02 (US);
E02D2300/0085 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249981 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/08] | Extension states | AL | 31.05.1999 | LT | 31.05.1999 | LV | 31.05.1999 | MK | 31.05.1999 | RO | 31.05.1999 | SI | 31.05.1999 | Title | German: | Geotextile Filterstruktur | [1999/08] | English: | Geotextile filter structure | [1999/08] | French: | Structure géotextile de filtration | [1999/08] | Examination procedure | 31.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 10.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.08.2002 | [2004/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0390755 (SAVAL SRL [IT]) [A] 1,3,4 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0459203 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 15 - line 25; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0564799 (SANDLER C H GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]DE9320208U (KALTHOFF LUFTFILTER UND FILTER [DE]) [A] 1,4 * claims 1-3 * |