EP0900822 - Bituminous binder, its composition and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Appia 143, Avenue de Verdun 92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | [2003/40] |
Former [1999/10] | For all designated states SOCIETE ANONYME D'APPLICATION DES DERIVES DE L'ASPHALTE- S.A.A.D.A. Route Nationale 7, B.P. 20, Salaise-sur-Sanne F-38150 Roussillon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pasquier, Michel 24, rue des Châtaigniers 69960 Corbas / FR | [1999/10] | Representative(s) | Rousset, Jean-Claude Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | Rousset, Jean-Claude Cabinet Netter 40, rue Vignon 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98402118.8 | 26.08.1998 | [1999/10] | Priority number, date | FR19970011079 | 05.09.1997 Original published format: FR 9711079 | [1999/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0900822 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0900822 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/101, C08L95/00 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
C08K5/101 (EP,US);
C08L95/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/101, C08L95/00 (EP,US);
C08L95/00, C08L2666/68 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/03] |
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT | ||
Former [1999/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bituminöses Bindemittel, seine Zusammensetzung und seine Verwendung | [1999/10] | English: | Bituminous binder, its composition and its use | [1999/10] | French: | Liant bitumineux, composition et utilisation | [1999/10] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 27.04.2001 | Observations by third parties | 10.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2877129 (HARDMAN HARLEY F); | [A]US3366500 (PAUL KRACAUER) | Examination | DE19519539 | other | DE19519539 |