EP0901961 - Rotorcraft rotor blade with reduced acoustic signature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Office National d'Etudes et de Recherches Aérospatiales (ONERA) 29, Avenue de la Division-Leclerc 92320 Châtillon / FR | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Linder Höhe 51147 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states ONERA (Office National d'Etudes et de Recherches Aérospatiales) 29, Avenue de la Division-Leclerc 92320 Châtillon / FR | ||
For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Linder Höhe 51147 Köln / DE | |||
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states ONERA (Office National d'Etudes et de Recherches Aérospatiales) 29, Avenue de la Division-Leclerc 92320 Châtillon / FR | ||
For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Linder Höhe 51147 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Splettstoesser, Wolf R. Am Klei 19 38110 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
Van der Wall, Berend Kleiberweg 4 38110 Braunschweig / DE | 03 /
Delrieux, Yves 10 avenue Saint Rémy 93200 Saint-Denis / FR | 04 /
Gardarein, Patrick 2 rue Grange Fontenelle 92410 Ville d'Avray / FR | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | Bérogin, Francis Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | Bérogin, Francis Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98402203.8 | 07.09.1998 | [1999/11] | Priority number, date | FR19970011230 | 10.09.1997 Original published format: FR 9711230 | [1999/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0901961 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0901961 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/467 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
B64C27/467 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/48] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rotorblatt eines Drehflügelflugzeuges mit reduzierten, akustischen Eigenschaften | [1999/11] | English: | Rotorcraft rotor blade with reduced acoustic signature | [1999/11] | French: | Pale à signature sonore réduite pour voilure tournante d'aéronef | [1999/11] | Examination procedure | 08.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 18.09.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 10.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.10.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB264965 (CIERVA JUAN DE LA) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2475337 (PLATT HAVILAND H) [A] 1 * column 5, line 71 - column 6, line 15 ** figure 3 *; | [A]US3065933 (WILLIAMS PAUL E) [A] 1-15 * column 5, line 37 - line 67 * * figure 9 *; | [A]GB2001023 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5584661 (BROOKS THOMAS F [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |