EP0902263 - Method and apparatus for determining the vibrations of the rotor of a rotary machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TotalFinaElf France Tour Total, 24, cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states TotalFinaElf France Tour Total, 24, cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states TOTAL RAFFINAGE DISTRIBUTION S.A. Tour Total, 24 cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nguyen, The Tam 38, Avenue Foch 76600 Le Havre / FR | 02 /
Lenclud, Christian 7, allée de l'Etang 78540 Vernouillet / FR | 03 /
Bigret, Roland 23, rue Jean Varnet 93700 Drancy / FR | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98402260.8 | 14.09.1998 | [1999/11] | Priority number, date | FR19970011449 | 15.09.1997 Original published format: FR 9711449 | [1999/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0902263 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0902263 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01H1/00 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
G01H1/003 (EP,US);
G01H9/00 (EP,US);
G01M1/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/48] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung von Schwingungen des Rotors einer drehenden Maschine | [2004/02] | English: | Method and apparatus for determining the vibrations of the rotor of a rotary machine | [1999/11] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la détermination des vibrations du rotor d'une machine tournante | [1999/11] |
Former [1999/11] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung von Schwingungen des Rotors einer Drehmaschine | Examination procedure | 06.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 07.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.05.2004 | FI | 19.05.2004 | IE | 19.05.2004 | NL | 19.05.2004 | DK | 19.08.2004 | GR | 19.08.2004 | SE | 19.08.2004 | ES | 30.08.2004 | LU | 14.09.2004 | BE | 30.09.2004 | CH | 30.09.2004 | LI | 30.09.2004 | PT | 19.10.2004 | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
NL | 19.05.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
LU | 14.09.2004 | ||
BE | 30.09.2004 | ||
CH | 30.09.2004 | ||
LI | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
NL | 19.05.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
BE | 30.09.2004 | ||
CH | 30.09.2004 | ||
LI | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
BE | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 19.05.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 19.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3044440 (HOFMANN GMBH & CO KG MASCHINEN [DE]) [A] 1,14,17 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0246637 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [AD] 1* claim 1 * |